Council Regulation (EC) No 423/2007 of 19 April 2007 concerning restrictive measures against Iran (repealed)
Changes over time for: Division
B.
Version Superseded: 19/06/2010
Status:
Point in time view as at 12/03/2008.
Changes to legislation:
There are currently no known outstanding effects for the Council Regulation (EC) No 423/2007 (repealed), Division
B.
.
Changes to Legislation
Revised legislation carried on this site may not be fully up to date. At the current time any known changes or effects made by subsequent legislation have been applied to the text of the legislation you are viewing by the editorial team. Please see ‘Frequently Asked Questions’ for details regarding the timescales for which new effects are identified and recorded on this site.
[B. Natural persons U.K.
(1) Fereidoun Abbasi-Davani . Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . Other information: Senior Ministry of Defence and Armed Forces Logistics (MODAFL) scientist with links to the Institute of Applied Physics. Working closely with Mohsen Fakhrizadeh-Mahabadi. U.K.
(2) Dawood Agha-Jani . Function: Head of the PFEP - Natanz. Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in Iran’s nuclear programme. U.K.
(3) Ali Akbar Ahmadian . Title: Vice Admiral. Function: Chief of Iranian Revolutionary Guard Corps (IRGC) Joint Staff. Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . U.K.
(4) Amir Moayyed Alai . Date of EU designation: 24.4.2007 (UN: 3.3.2008 ). Other information: involved in managing the assembly and engineering of centrifuges. U.K.
(5) Behman Asgarpour . Function: Operational Manager (Arak). Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in Iran’s nuclear programme. U.K.
(6) Mohammad Fedai Ashiani . Date of EU designation: 24.4.2007 (UN: 3.3.2008 ). Other information: involved in the production of ammonium uranyl carbonate and management of the Natanz enrichment complex. U.K.
(7) Abbas Rezaee Ashtiani . Date of UN designation: 3.3.2008 . Other information: a senior official at the AEOI Office of Exploration and Mining Affairs. U.K.
(8) Bahmanyar Morteza Bahmanyar . Function: Head of Finance & Budget Dept, Aerospace Industries Organisation (AIO). Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in Iran’s ballistic missile programme. U.K.
(9) Haleh Bakhtiar . Date of EU designation: 24.4.2007 (UN: 3.3.2008 ). Other information: involved in the production of magnesium at a concentration of 99.9 %. U.K.
(10) Morteza Behzad . Date of EU designation: 24.4.2007 (UN: 3.3.2008 ). Other information: involved in making centrifuge components. U.K.
(11) Ahmad Vahid Dastjerdi . Function: Head of the Aerospace Industries Organisation (AIO). Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in Iran’s ballistic missile programme. U.K.
(12) Ahmad Derakhshandeh . Function: Chairman and Managing Director of Bank Sepah. Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . U.K.
(13) Mohammad Eslami . Title: Dr. Date of UN designation: 3.3.2008 . Other information: Head of Defence Industries Training and Research Institute. U.K.
(14) Reza-Gholi Esmaeli . Function: Head of Trade & International Affairs Dept, Aerospace Industries Organisation (AIO). Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in Iran’s ballistic missile programme. U.K.
(15) Mohsen Fakhrizadeh-Mahabadi . Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . Other information: Senior MODAFL scientist and former head of the Physics Research Centre (PHRC). U.K.
(16) Mohammad Hejazi . Title: Brigadier General. Function: Commander of Bassij resistance force. Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . U.K.
(17) Mohsen Hojati . Function: Head of Fajr Industrial Group. Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . U.K.
(18) Seyyed Hussein Hosseini . Date of EU designation: 24.4.2007 (UN: 3.3.2008 ). Other information: AEOI official involved in the heavy water research reactor project at Arak. U.K.
(19) M. Javad Karimi Sabet . Date of EU designation: 24.4.2007 (UN: 3.3.2008 ). Other information: Head of Novin Energy Company, which is designated under resolution 1747 (2007). U.K.
(20) Mehrdada Akhlaghi Ketabachi . Function: Head of Shahid Bagheri Industrial Group (SBIG). Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . U.K.
(21) Ali Hajinia Leilabadi . Function: Director General of Mesbah Energy Company. Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in Iran’s nuclear programme. U.K.
(22) Naser Maleki . Function: Head of Shahid Hemmat Industrial Group (SHIG). Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . Other information: Naser Maleki is also a MODAFL official overseeing work on the Shahab-3 ballistic missile programme. The Shahab-3 is Iran’s long-range ballistic missile currently in service. U.K.
(23) Hamid-Reza Mohajerani . Date of EU designation: 24.4.2007 (UN: 3.3.2008 ). Other information: involved in production management at the Uranium Conversion Facility (UCF) at Esfahan. U.K.
(24) Jafar Mohammadi . Function: Technical Adviser to the Atomic Energy Organisation of Iran (AEOI) (in charge of managing the production of valves for centrifuges). Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in Iran’s nuclear programme. U.K.
(25) Ehsan Monajemi . Function: Construction Project Manager, Natanz. Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in Iran’s nuclear programme. U.K.
(26) Mohammad Reza Naqdi . Title: Brigadier General. Date of UN designation: 3.3.2008 . Other information: former Deputy Chief of Armed Forces General Staff for Logistics and Industrial Research/Head of State Anti-Smuggling Headquarters, engaged in efforts to get round the sanctions imposed by resolutions 1737 (2006) and 1747 (2007). U.K.
(27) Houshang Nobari . Date of EU designation: 24.4.2007 (UN: 3.3.2008 ). Other information: involved in the management of the Natanz enrichment complex. U.K.
(28) Mohammad Mehdi Nejad Nouri . Title: Lt Gen. Function: Rector of Malek Ashtar University of Defence Technology. Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: The chemistry department of Ashtar University of Defence Technology is affiliated to MODALF and has conducted experiments on beryllium. Person involved in Iran’s nuclear programme. U.K.
(29) Mohammad Qannadi . Function: AEOI Vice President for Research & Development. Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in Iran’s nuclear programme. U.K.
(30) Amir Rahimi . Function: Head of Esfahan Nuclear Fuel Research and Production Center. Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . Other information: Esfahan Nuclear Fuel Research and Production Center is part of the AEOI’s Nuclear Fuel Production and Procurement Company, which is involved in enrichment-related activities. U.K.
(31) Abbas Rashidi . Date of EU designation: 24.4.2007 (UN: 3.3.2008 ). Other information: involved in enrichment work at Natanz. U.K.
(32) Morteza Rezaie . Title: Brigadier General. Function: Deputy Commander of IRGC. Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . U.K.
(33) Morteza Safari . Title: Rear Admiral. Function: Commander of IRGC Navy. Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . U.K.
(34) Yahya Rahim Safavi . Title: Maj Gen. Function: Commander, IRGC (Pasdaran). Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in both Iran’s nuclear and ballistic missile programmes. U.K.
(35) Seyed Jaber Safdari . Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . Other information: Manager of the Natanz Enrichment Facilities. U.K.
(36) Hosein Salimi . Title: General. Function: Commander of the Air Force, IRGC (Pasdaran). Date of UN designation: 23.12.2006 . Other information: Person involved in Iran’s ballistic missile programme. U.K.
(37) Qasem Soleimani . Title: Brigadier General. Function: Commander of Qods force. Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . U.K.
(38) Ghasem Soleymani . Date of UN designation: 3.3.2008 . Other information: Director of Uranium Mining Operations at the Saghand Uranium Mine. U.K.
(39) Mohammad Reza Zahedi . Title: Brigadier General. Function: Commander of IRGC Ground Forces. Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 . U.K.
(40) General Zolqadr . Function: Deputy Interior Minister for Security Affairs, IRGC officer. Date of UN designation: 24.3.2007 .] U.K.
Back to top